Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Crouzet, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Zephyrium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1849Born
7 Jun 187324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1 Oct 188839.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
1 Oct 188839.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
28 Oct 188839.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zephyrium
16 Jan 189646.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Madagascar {Madagascar Meridionale}, Madagascar
8 Jan 193383.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Crouzet (VIAF: 9945754)
Bishop Jean-Jacques Crouzet C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fort-Dauphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLansargues, Diocese of Montpellier, France
Ordained BishopLazarists, rue de Sevres, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017