Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy-Louis-Jean-Marie Alouvry

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1799BornLondon, Great Britain
24 May 182324.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 184646.9SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Apr 184647.1ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
31 May 184647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
8 Mar 185657.0ResignedBishop of Pamiers, France
29 Dec 187374.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Guy-Louis-Jean-Marie Alouvry:
Bishop Guy-Louis-Jean-Marie Alouvry (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamiers

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • r: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 112
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013