Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Théodore Olivier

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1798BornParis
16 Jun 182123.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 184143.0SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
12 Jul 184143.2ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
6 Aug 184143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
21 Oct 185456.5DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Théodore Olivier:
Bishop Nicolas-Théodore Olivier (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013