Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Thomas Thibault

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1796BornBeynes
26 Feb 182024.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 183539.2SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
24 Jul 183539.4ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
23 Aug 183539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
4 May 186165.1DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Thomas Thibault:
Bishop Charles-Thomas Thibault (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015