Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul-Hilaire-Michel Courvezy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malacca-Singapore

Titular Bishop of Bida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1792BornNarbonne, France
5 Apr 183240.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
5 Apr 183240.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
30 Nov 183341.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
30 Mar 183442.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
10 Sep 184149.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
18 May 184553.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
1 May 185765.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malacca-Singapore

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul-Hilaire-Michel Courvezy:
Bishop Jean-Paul-Hilaire-Michel Courvezy M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Malacca-Singapore

  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013