Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand-Sévère Mascarou-Laurence

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1790BornOroix
29 Apr 182130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tarbes, France
8 Jan 184554.3SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
21 Apr 184554.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
1 Jun 184554.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
30 Jan 187079.3DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand-Sévère Mascarou-Laurence (VIAF: 78768084)
Bishop Bertrand-Sévère Mascarou-Laurence (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016