Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Hector Thomas, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1833Born
4 May 188349.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
4 May 188349.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
22 Jul 188349.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
9 Sep 189056.9ResignedApostolic Delegate to Persia
14 Dec 191077.2DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Hector Thomas
Archbishop Jacques-Hector Thomas C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Persia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDax, France
Ordained BishopC.M. 95 rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017