Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
18 Jun 1866 | Born | ||
26 Sep 1885 | 19.2 | Professed | Member of Congregation of the Mission |
11 Jun 1892 | 25.9 | Ordained Deacon | Deacon of Congregation of the Mission |
17 Dec 1892 | 26.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Congregation of the Mission |
19 Aug 1912 | 46.1 | Appointed | Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale}, China |
19 Aug 1912 | 46.1 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Elaea |
3 Nov 1912 | 46.3 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Elaea |
5 Jan 1928 | 61.5 | Resigned | Vicar Apostolic of Yükiang [Yujiang], China |
2 Aug 1935 | 69.1 | Died | Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yükiang [Yujiang], China |
(WikiData: Q64734448)
Bishop
Jean-Louis
Clerc-Renaud
C.M.
(born , died )
Vicar Apostolic Emeritus
of Yükiang [Yujiang]
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France |
Ordained Deacon | Lazarists, Mother House, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Ordained Priest | Lazarists, Mother House, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Ordained Bishop | Daughters of Charity, Chapel, Yaotchow (Jaochow), Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale} |
Death Place | Lazarists, Mother House, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Buried Place (Original) | Montparnasse, Cemetery, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠