Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Géraud Bray, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1825Born
13 Dec 185025.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
21 May 185327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
15 Mar 187044.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
15 Mar 187044.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
20 Nov 187044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
19 Aug 187953.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China
24 Sep 190579.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Géraud Bray
Bishop Géraud Bray C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiran, France

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017