Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Sylvain-Marius Fabrègues, C.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China

Titular Bishop of Alalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1872Born
1890²17.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
30 May 189623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Feb 191037.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale}, China
22 Feb 191037.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
22 May 191037.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
12 Jun 192350.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
24 Nov 192855.9DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Sylvain-Marius Fabrègues
Bishop Joseph-Sylvain-Marius Fabrègues C.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier, France
Ordained BishopPaotingfu
Death PlaceNovosibirsk

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 42
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 40
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast