Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislas-François Jarlin, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China

Titular Bishop of Pharbaethus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1856Born
1884¹27.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Jan 188933.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
23 Dec 189943.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
28 Dec 189943.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
29 Apr 190044.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
5 Apr 190549.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
26 Jan 193377.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanislas-François Jarlin
Bishop Stanislas-François Jarlin C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSète, Diocese of Montpellier, France
Ordained BishopPekin, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
Death PlacePeking, Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 122
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast