Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Joseph Bulté, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1830BornHéricourt, France
1854¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
1861¹30.1ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Mar 188049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
23 Mar 188049.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China
29 Jun 188049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
14 Oct 190069.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri-Joseph Bulté:
Bishop Henri-Joseph Bulté S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013