Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Simon, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

Titular Bishop of Circesium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1846BornIssé, France
1868¹21.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1882¹35.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Jan 189952.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
7 Jan 189952.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Circesium
25 Jun 189952.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Circesium
10 Aug 1899³52.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Simon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Simon S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

  • a priest for 17.6 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013