Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Garnier, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

Titular Bishop of Titiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1825BornSaint-Germain-en-Coglès, France
1848¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
1852¹26.7ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Jan 187953.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
21 Jan 187953.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
27 Apr 187954.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titiopolis
14 Aug 189873.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valentin Garnier:
Bishop Valentin Garnier S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiangnan

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013