Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas-Marie Gentili, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1828Born
1 Feb 184617.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Feb 184921.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Nov 185022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 May 186840.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
10 May 186840.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
7 Jun 186840.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
12 Jul 188456.4ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
31 Aug 188860.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Thomas-Marie Gentili (VIAF: 58708568)
Bishop Thomas-Marie Gentili O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieti, Archdiocese of Chieti, Italy, Italy

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017