Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Calderón, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Bodona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1803Born
1818²14.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Sep 183127.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
9 Sep 183127.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bodona
16 Feb 184036.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bodona
30 Dec 184946.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
14 Feb 188379.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Calderón
Bishop Miguel Calderón O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Ordained BishopLam-kann
Death PlaceSe-in

  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 114
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 150, Number 820
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 4
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 1 Jan 2020

Quantcast