Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Alfonso Aguilar, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1814BornJaén, Spain
10 Apr 183116.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jul 184227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Sep 184833.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
5 Sep 184833.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
8 Sep 185035.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
26 Nov 186853.9ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
12 Dec 187459.9DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Justo Alfonso Aguilar
Bishop Justo Alfonso Aguilar O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Fo-Kien

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 538
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 159, Number 869
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016