Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gainza Escobás, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1818Born
18 Sep 184123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Mar 186243.8SelectedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
25 Sep 186244.3ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
22 Feb 186344.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
31 Jul 187961.1DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gainza Escobás (VIAF: 19805728)
Bishop Francisco Gainza Escobás O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño, Spain
Ordained BishopDominican Church, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 170, Number 938
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,863, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast