Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Ferrer Carreras, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1830Born
15 Jan 185423.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
30 Jan 186635.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
30 Jan 186635.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
21 Oct 186636.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
16 Sep 186737.4DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ferrer Carreras
Bishop Vicente Ferrer Carreras O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegencós, Diocese of Gerona, Spain

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 955
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018