Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephrem Giesen, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Paltus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1868BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
4 Oct 188719.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 189324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Jul 190233.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China
23 Jul 190233.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paltus
16 Nov 190234.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paltus
6 Aug 191950.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Ephrem Giesen:
Bishop Ephrem Giesen O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 436
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013