Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Anton Hofman, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Telmissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1834BornVoerden, Netherlands
4 Oct 185521.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Aug 185824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 189156.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China
24 Apr 189156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
6 Sep 189157.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
16 Jul 1901³67.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China
26 Oct 191783.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Anton Hofman:
Bishop Johannes Anton Hofman O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 539

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013