Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacobus Cornelis Meeuwissen, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1847BornOud Gastel
26 Apr 186820.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Oct 187326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 Jan 190759.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
7 Jan 190759.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
3 Mar 190759.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusa
18 Dec 191164.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles
29 Jun 191668.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname, Suriname, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Jacobus Cornelis Meeuwissen:
Bishop Jacobus Cornelis Meeuwissen C.SS.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dutch Guyana-Suriname

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013