Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestin Ibáñez y Aparicio, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yan’an [Yenan]

Titular Bishop of Caeciri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1873BornBecerril de Campos, Spain
15 Oct 189118.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Sep 189825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Apr 191137.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
12 Apr 191137.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
10 Sep 191138.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
11 Apr 194672.9AppointedBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
13 Jan 194975.7RetiredBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
13 Jan 194975.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
18 Aug 195178.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Yan’an [Yenan], China

MicroData Summary for Celestin Ibáñez y Aparicio:
Bishop Celestin Ibáñez y Aparicio O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yan’an [Yenan]

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013