Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Henri Baldus, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1811BornAlly, France
11 Jun 182918.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
Mar 1834³23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
2 Mar 184433.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
2 Mar 184433.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
19 Oct 184534.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
1865²53.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
29 Sep 186958.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Henri Baldus
Bishop Jean-Henri Baldus C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 403
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016