Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Ferdinand Tagliabue, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

Titular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1822Born
17 Jun 184825.5Ordained PriestPriest
1852¹29.0ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 Sep 186845.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
25 Sep 186845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
22 Jul 186946.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
11 Dec 187048.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
26 Aug 188461.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
13 Mar 189067.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Ferdinand Tagliabue
Bishop François-Ferdinand Tagliabue C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoincy-l'Abbaye, France

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 462
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017