Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Grégoire Grassi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1833Born
14 Dec 184916.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
17 Aug 185622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Jan 187642.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
25 Jan 187642.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
19 Nov 187642.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
17 Jun 189157.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China
9 Jul 190066.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}, China
24 Nov 1946Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Grégoire Grassi (VIAF: 316421127)
Bishop St. Grégoire Grassi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellazzo-Bormida, Italy

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017