Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamino Geremia, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Usula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1843Born
18 Jul 188441.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
18 Jul 188441.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
10 Feb 188541.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
1 Nov 188542.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
8 Jan 188642.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China
29 Dec 188845.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Benjamino Geremia
Bishop Benjamino Geremia O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni in Galdo, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 576
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017