Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Hubertus Hamer, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Tremithus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1840BornNijmwegen, Netherlands
186423.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Aug 186424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Jun 187837.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kansu, China
21 Jun 187837.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
27 Oct 187838.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
15 Feb 188948.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
25 Jul 190059.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Hubertus Hamer:
Bishop Ferdinand Hubertus Hamer C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013