Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaak Bax, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}, China

Titular Bishop of Adrasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1824Born
17 Dec 185329.4Ordained PriestPriest
1863¹38.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
22 May 187146.9AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
23 Oct 187450.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
23 Oct 187450.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
6 Jun 187550.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
21 Dec 188359.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}, China
4 Jan 189570.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaak Bax
Bishop Jaak Bax C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeelde, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Ordained BishopSiwantze, Vicariate Apostolic of Mongolia

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017