Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Otto, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1850Born
1868¹17.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
7 Jun 187322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
20 Jun 189039.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kansu, China
20 Jun 189039.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
11 Jan 189140.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
14 Jan 191867.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}, China
25 Feb 1938³87.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hubert Otto (VIAF: 289109861)
Bishop Hubert Otto C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles, Belgium

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 127
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017