Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-André Boyer, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1824Born
14 Jun 185126.9Ordained PriestPriest
1854¹29.5ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Apr 188661.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China
13 Apr 188661.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
15 Aug 188662.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
8 Mar 188762.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-André Boyer
Bishop Joseph-André Boyer M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-en-Provence, Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017