Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Auguste Coqset, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Cardicium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1847BornAmbleny, France
1 Oct 186619.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
8 Jun 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Jul 188740.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale}, China
19 Jul 188740.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
16 Oct 188740.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
3 May 190759.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
2 Feb 191769.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China

MicroData Summary for Jules-Auguste Coqset:
Bishop Jules-Auguste Coqset C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013