Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin-Pierre Cluzel, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Persia

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1815Born
3 Mar 187458.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
30 Mar 187459.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
8 Sep 187459.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
12 Aug 188267.4DiedApostolic Delegate to Persia

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Pierre Cluzel
Archbishop Augustin-Pierre Cluzel C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Persia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontclair, France
Ordained BishopLazaristes-95, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast