Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Olivieri

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1834Born
28 Mar 185722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
7 Dec 189965.1SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
14 Dec 189965.2ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Feb 190065.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
17 May 190368.6DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Olivieri
Bishop Louis Olivieri (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZerubia

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast