Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cassien-Léonard de Péretti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1822Born
18 Dec 184725.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 187552.8SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France
31 Mar 187552.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France
31 Mar 187552.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
6 May 187553.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
22 Feb 189269.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Cassien-Léonard de Péretti (VIAF: 89392784)
Bishop Cassien-Léonard de Péretti (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLevie
Ordained BishopLazaristes, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017