Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elie-Antoine Durand

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1888BornRevel
21 Sep 191224.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 193547.3AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
25 Jul 193547.4Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
5 Nov 193951.7DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Elie-Antoine Durand:
Bishop Elie-Antoine Durand (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

  • a priest for 27.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013