Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Étienne Louis Cardinal Eyt

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1934BornLaruns
29 Jun 196127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron), France
7 Jun 198652.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
28 Sep 198652.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
31 May 198955.0SucceededArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
26 Nov 199460.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199460.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
11 Jun 200167.0DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Étienne Louis Eyt:
Cardinal Pierre Étienne Louis Eyt (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 5 Sep 2013