Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Charles Marie Descubes

Archbishop of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1940 BornTonnay-Charente
3 Jul 196525.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
13 Dec 199656.8AppointedBishop of Agen, France
9 Mar 199757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
25 Mar 200464.1AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles Marie Descubes:
Archbishop Jean-Charles Marie Descubes (born ) Archbishop of Rouen

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rouen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,931
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Jan 2014