Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Louis Antoine Marie David

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1930Born
29 Jun 195625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
27 Jul 198150.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
27 Jul 198150.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
26 Sep 198150.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
21 Feb 198554.1AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
2 Feb 199665.1AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
28 Jan 200675.0RetiredBishop of Evreux, France
19 Dec 201887.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Louis Antoine Marie David (VIAF: 56639257)
Bishop Jacques Louis Antoine Marie David (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Aubin-la Plaine, Diocese of Luçon
Ordained BishopSaint-Louis, Church, La Roche-sur-Yon, Diocese of Luçon
Death PlaceCentre Hospitalier Départemental, La Roche-sur-Yon, Diocese of Luçon
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Chaillé-les-Marais, Diocese of Luçon

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • d: CB, 19 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 31 Dec 2018

Quantcast