Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Hertzog

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

Titular Bishop of Tigias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1935BornBordeaux
30 Jun 196226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
24 Oct 200267.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
24 Oct 200267.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
22 Dec 200267.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
24 Nov 200570.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Hertzog:
Bishop Jean-Claude Hertzog (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,296
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015