Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Philippe Pierre Robert Nourrichard

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1948 BornNotre-Dame-de-Bondeville
23 Jun 197426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
22 Oct 200557.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Evreux, France
18 Dec 200557.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Evreux, France
28 Jan 200657.6SucceededBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Christian Philippe Pierre Robert Nourrichard:
Bishop Christian Philippe Pierre Robert Nourrichard (born ) Bishop of Evreux

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evreux.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,021
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015