Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Auguste-Marie Paty

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1916BornPipriac
24 Mar 194630.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 196649.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luçon, France
3 Jan 196649.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingaria
25 Mar 196650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tingaria
7 Dec 196650.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luçon, France
4 Jul 196751.4SucceededBishop of Luçon, France
25 Mar 199175.1RetiredBishop of Luçon, France
31 Dec 200488.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Auguste-Marie Paty:
Bishop Charles-Auguste-Marie Paty (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015