Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Barthélemy-Marie de Cambourg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1908BornNantes
23 Sep 193324.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 196253.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bourges, France
24 Feb 196253.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eutyme
10 May 196253.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eutyme
6 Mar 196657.2AppointedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
1 Dec 197768.9ResignedBishop of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France
13 Feb 200091.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Barthélemy-Marie de Cambourg:
Bishop Jean-Barthélemy-Marie de Cambourg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 52
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015