Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Jean Perrin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1894BornSegré
21 May 192126.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 194551.2AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
19 Jan 194651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
26 Nov 196167.3ResignedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
26 Nov 196167.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Blaundus
10 Dec 197076.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Blaundus
31 Jan 197176.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Jean Perrin:
Bishop Victor-Jean Perrin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015