Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Maurice Parenty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

Titular Bishop of Sitifis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1895BornSaint-Omer
29 Jun 191822.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 195054.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
9 Mar 195054.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sitifis
1 May 195054.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sitifis
5 Sep 197580.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
23 Nov 198388.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for André-Maurice Parenty:
Bishop André-Maurice Parenty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013