Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alphonse Marie Evrard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1889BornMuncq-Nieurlet
21 Sep 191223.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 193747.7AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
8 Apr 193747.9Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
25 Jul 194253.2ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
25 Jul 194253.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiopolis
10 Dec 197081.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Dionysiopolis
30 Sep 197485.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alphonse Marie Evrard:
Bishop Joseph Alphonse Marie Evrard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013