Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie-Jean-Baptiste Chappe

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1888BornMont-Bernanchon
13 Jul 191324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
6 Apr 194960.7AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Oct 194961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
12 Oct 196072.2DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Jean-Baptiste Chappe:
Bishop Joseph-Marie-Jean-Baptiste Chappe (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013