Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel-Pierre-Armand Riopel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Titular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1899BornBruz
6 Jul 192526.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 195152.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
30 Oct 195152.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria
17 Jan 195252.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Syria
23 Mar 197475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
24 Oct 198889.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Marcel-Pierre-Armand Riopel:
Bishop Marcel-Pierre-Armand Riopel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013