Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Michel Arthur Alix Zacharie Raimbaud, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop of Laghouat, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1924Born
1 Feb 195025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Jan 196843.5AppointedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
19 May 196843.8Ordained BishopBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
25 Jun 198964.9DiedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Michel Arthur Alix Zacharie Raimbaud
Bishop Jean-Marie Michel Arthur Alix Zacharie Raimbaud M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop of Laghouat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Hilaire de Talmont, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Luçon, Diocese of Luçon, France

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast