Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre François Marie Joly

Auxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Titular Bishop of Privata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1971 Born
29 Jun 199624.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rouen, France
28 Jun 199725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
14 Dec 201847.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
14 Dec 201847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Privata
10 Feb 201947.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Privata

MicroData Summary for Alexandre François Marie Joly
Bishop Alexandre François Marie Joly (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Malo, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Ordained DeaconNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 14 Dec 2018
  • c0+/loc: AJ, 3 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast